Sie sind auf Seite 1von 9
Mathematics Pratomsuksa 5 Chapter 2 Notes 2 Operations on Whole Numbers
Mathematics Pratomsuksa 5
Chapter 2
Notes
2
Operations on
Whole Numbers

• Combined Operations

When performing combined operations, do the operations within brackets first.

In the absence of brackets, do the multiplication and division before doing the addition and subtraction.

Example:

1,809 + 675 × 44 – 92,400 ÷ 33 =

subtraction. Example: 1,809 + 675 × 44 – 92,400 ÷ 33 = Incorrect Method 1,809 +

Incorrect Method

1,809 + 675 × 44 – 92,400 ÷ 33

= 2,484 × 44 – 92,400 ÷ 33

= 109,296 – 92,400 ÷ 33

= 512 8

Correct Method

1,809 + 675 × 44 – 92,400 ÷ 33

= 1,809 + (675 × 44) – (92,400 ÷ 33) *

= 1,809 + 29,700 – 2,800

= 31,509 – 2,800

= 28,709 4

* You may insert brackets to help you in your working.

= 28,709 4 * You may insert brackets to help you in your working. 02 Pri
= 28,709 4 * You may insert brackets to help you in your working. 02 Pri

02 Pri Edu WB Math P5.indd

7 7
7
7
= 28,709 4 * You may insert brackets to help you in your working. 02 Pri
= 28,709 4 * You may insert brackets to help you in your working. 02 Pri

2/17/11

= 28,709 4 * You may insert brackets to help you in your working. 02 Pri

9:29:42 AM

Mathematics Pratomsuksa 5

Chapter 2

Exercises
Exercises
Mathematics Pratomsuksa 5 Chapter 2 Exercises

A Calculate each of the following.

1.

34,327 + (134,200 – 600)

2.

162,157 – (42,242 + 37,577)

= 34,327 + 133,600

 

= 162,157 – 79,819

 

= 167,927

= 82,338

134,200

34,327

42,242

162,157

—–—— 600

133,600 —–—— +

—–—— 37,577 +

—–—— 79,819

 

167,927 ——–—

—–—— 79,819

——–— 82,338

 

133,600 —–—— —–——

——–—

—–——

——–—

3.

(6,256 + 6,256) – 7,552

4.

(13,133 + 62,721) + (57,123 +

= 12,512 – 7,552

 

60,999)

= 4,960

= 75,854 + 118,122

 
 

= 193,976

 

6,256

12,512

13,133

57,123

75,854

——— 6,256 +

——— 7,552

—–—— 62,721 +

—–—— 60,999 +

118,122 —–—— +

12,512 ———

 

——— 4,960

—–—— 75,854

118,122 ——–—

193,976 —–——

—–——

——–—

———–

———

———

 

5.

(76,721 + 27,592) – (10,011 +

6.

(372,654 – 18,213) – (60,711 –

32,752)

2,723)

= 104,313 – 42,763

 

= 354,441 – 57,988

 

= 61,550

= 296,453

76,721

10,011

104,313

372,654

60,711

354,441

—–—— 27,592 +

—–—— 32,752 +

—–—— 42,763

—–—— 18,213

—–—— 2,723

—–—— 57,988

104,313 —–——

——–— 42,763

—–—— 61,550

354,441 —–——

——–— 57,988

296,453 —–——

—–——

——–—

———–

—–——

——–—

———–

———– —–—— ——–— ———– 02 Pri Edu WB Math P5.indd 8 8 2/17/11 9:29:42 AM
———– —–—— ——–— ———– 02 Pri Edu WB Math P5.indd 8 8 2/17/11 9:29:42 AM

02 Pri Edu WB Math P5.indd

8 8
8
8
———– —–—— ——–— ———– 02 Pri Edu WB Math P5.indd 8 8 2/17/11 9:29:42 AM
———– —–—— ——–— ———– 02 Pri Edu WB Math P5.indd 8 8 2/17/11 9:29:42 AM

2/17/11

———– —–—— ——–— ———– 02 Pri Edu WB Math P5.indd 8 8 2/17/11 9:29:42 AM

9:29:42 AM

Mathematics Pratomsuksa 5

Chapter 2

Exercises
Exercises

B

Calculate each of the following.

 

1.

(200 × 3) ÷ 15

2.

(1,560 ÷ 13) × 17

= 600 ÷ 15

= 120 × 17

= 40

= 2,040

 

40

 
 

200

—— 3 ×

15 600 600 ——

15 600

600

——

 

120

120 13 1560 1300

13 1560

1300

120

——– 17 ×

600

00

260

840

—— ——

0

260

1200

 

—–—

 

—— ——

0

2040

 

—–— —–—

0

3.

(16,200 ÷ 18) × (13,650 ÷ 25)

4.

(32 × 120) ÷ (6,270 ÷ 627)

= 900 × 546

= 3,840 ÷ 10

= 491,400

= 384

5.

(21,084 ÷ 28) ÷ (19,647 ÷ 6,549)

6.

62,727 + (3,723 × 13)

= 753 ÷ 3

= 62,727 + 48,399

= 251

= 111,126

× 13) = 753 ÷ 3 = 62,727 + 48,399 = 251 = 111,126 02 Pri
× 13) = 753 ÷ 3 = 62,727 + 48,399 = 251 = 111,126 02 Pri

02 Pri Edu WB Math P5.indd

9 9
9
9
× 13) = 753 ÷ 3 = 62,727 + 48,399 = 251 = 111,126 02 Pri
× 13) = 753 ÷ 3 = 62,727 + 48,399 = 251 = 111,126 02 Pri

2/17/11

× 13) = 753 ÷ 3 = 62,727 + 48,399 = 251 = 111,126 02 Pri

9:29:43 AM

Mathematics Pratomsuksa 5

Chapter 2

Exercises
Exercises

7.

(33,580 ÷ 92) × (40,726 – 39,216)

8.

(36,217 + 55,762) × (24,052 ÷ 859)

= 365 × 1510

= 551,150

= 91,979 × 28

 

= 2,575,412

9.

(61,172 × 13) – (271,255 ÷ 5)

10.

(303,216 – 176,602) × (5,092 – 5,059)

= 795,236 – 54,251

= 740,985

= 126,614 × 33

 

= 4,178,262

11.

(304 × 81) ÷ (32,632 – 32,608)

12.

(18,414 ÷ 22) + (7,200 × 122)

= 24,624 ÷ 24

= 837 + 878,400

= 1,026

= 879,237

122) = 24,624 ÷ 24 = 837 + 878,400 = 1,026 = 879,237 02 Pri Edu
122) = 24,624 ÷ 24 = 837 + 878,400 = 1,026 = 879,237 02 Pri Edu

02 Pri Edu WB Math P5.indd

10

10
10
122) = 24,624 ÷ 24 = 837 + 878,400 = 1,026 = 879,237 02 Pri Edu
122) = 24,624 ÷ 24 = 837 + 878,400 = 1,026 = 879,237 02 Pri Edu

2/17/11

122) = 24,624 ÷ 24 = 837 + 878,400 = 1,026 = 879,237 02 Pri Edu

9:29:43 AM

C Solve the problems.

Mathematics Pratomsuksa 5

Chapter 2

Exercises
Exercises

1. There are 15,078 teachers in a province. 4,346 new teachers join the service. 3,949 teachers retire. Find the number of teachers in the province now.

15,078

19,424

——–— 4,346 +

03,949 ———

19,424

15,475

—–—— —–——

——— ———

Number sentence: 15,078 + 4,346 – 3,949

 
 

= 19,424 – 3,949

= 15,475

There are

 

15,475

teachers now.

2. Lisa has 77,620 Baht in her account. She withdraws 5,600 Baht from her account. Later, she deposits 13,945 Baht into her account. How much money is left in her account?

 

Number sentence:

 

(77,620 – 5,600) + 13,945

=

85,965

85,965 Baht is left in her account.

3. In the first year, company A sold 376,576 pens. In the second year, it sold 451,203 pens. In the third year, it sold 32,974 pens less than the previous year. How many pens did the company sell in the three years?

 

Number sentence:

 

376,576 + 451,203 + (451,203 – 32,974)

=

1,246,008

 

The company sold 1,246,008 pens in the three years.

  The company sold 1,246,008 pens in the three years. 02 Pri Edu WB Math P5.indd
  The company sold 1,246,008 pens in the three years. 02 Pri Edu WB Math P5.indd

02 Pri Edu WB Math P5.indd

11

11
11
  The company sold 1,246,008 pens in the three years. 02 Pri Edu WB Math P5.indd
  The company sold 1,246,008 pens in the three years. 02 Pri Edu WB Math P5.indd

2/17/11

  The company sold 1,246,008 pens in the three years. 02 Pri Edu WB Math P5.indd

9:29:43 AM

Mathematics Pratomsuksa 5

Chapter 2

Exercises
Exercises

4. Matt is preparing to plant pineapples in his field. His field will have 386 rows of pineapples with 156 plants in each row. Matt estimates that his planting machine will be able to finish planting in 13 days. How many pineapples will the machine plant in a day?

Number sentence:

(386 × 156) ÷ 13

=

4,632

The machine will plant 4,632 pineapples a day.

5. Ying manages to sell 421 shirts at 250 Baht each. She then uses the money to buy two laptops for 35,000 Baht each. She then treats her family to a dinner that costs 4,325 Baht. How much money does Ying have left?

Number sentence:

(421 × 250) – (35,000 × 2) – 4,325

=

30,925

Ying has 30,925 Baht left.

6. James collected a donation of 1,200 Baht. Lina collected 3,270 Baht and John collected 3,210 Baht. The money was divided equally among 24 orphans. How much money did each orphan get?

Number sentence:

(1,200 + 3,270 + 3,210) ÷ 24 = 320

Each orphan got 320 Baht.

(1,200 + 3,270 + 3,210) ÷ 24 = 320 Each orphan got 320 Baht. 02 Pri
(1,200 + 3,270 + 3,210) ÷ 24 = 320 Each orphan got 320 Baht. 02 Pri

02 Pri Edu WB Math P5.indd

12

12
12
(1,200 + 3,270 + 3,210) ÷ 24 = 320 Each orphan got 320 Baht. 02 Pri
(1,200 + 3,270 + 3,210) ÷ 24 = 320 Each orphan got 320 Baht. 02 Pri

2/17/11

(1,200 + 3,270 + 3,210) ÷ 24 = 320 Each orphan got 320 Baht. 02 Pri

9:29:43 AM

Mathematics Pratomsuksa 5

Chapter 2

Exercises
Exercises

D Create a word problem based on each number sentence and solve it.

1. (10,250 × 10) + (7,300 × 12) =

   

Example :

 

A

factory produced 10,250 boxes of

ping-pong balls and 7,300 tubes of shuttlecocks. There are 10 ping-pong

balls in each box and 12 shuttlecocks

in

each tube. How many ping-pong

balls and shuttlecocks did the factory

produce in total?

 

(10,250 × 10) + (7,300 × 12) = 190,100

 

2. (13,680 ÷ 30) × 75 =

   

Example :

 

A

tray of 30 eggs costs 75 Baht. If a

farm produces 13,680 eggs, how much money can the farm make?

(13,680 ÷ 30) × 75 = 34,200

 

3. (45 × 150) + (150 × 132) =

   

Example :

 

A

seller sells mangoes at 45 Baht per

kilogram and has 150 kilograms of

mangoes. He also sells papaya at 150 Baht per kilogram and has 132 kilograms

of

papayas. If he manages to sell all his

fruits, how much money will he make?

(45 × 150) + (150 × 132) = 26,550

 
will he make? (45 × 150) + (150 × 132) = 26,550   02 Pri Edu
will he make? (45 × 150) + (150 × 132) = 26,550   02 Pri Edu

02 Pri Edu WB Math P5.indd

13 13
13
13
will he make? (45 × 150) + (150 × 132) = 26,550   02 Pri Edu
will he make? (45 × 150) + (150 × 132) = 26,550   02 Pri Edu

2/17/11

will he make? (45 × 150) + (150 × 132) = 26,550   02 Pri Edu

9:29:43 AM

Mathematics Pratomsuksa 5

Chapter 2

Mastery Practice

 
 
M M
M
M
a a
a a
s s
s s
t t
t t
e e
e e
r r
r r
y y
y y
P P
P P
r r
r r
a a
a a
c c
c c
t t
t t
i i
i i
c c
c c
e e
e e

1. Find the value of 216 × 34 +

9. Ace has 72 sweets which is 9

3,795.

 

more than Li, but 21 less than

A

4,339

C

136,374

 

Poy. How many sweets will

B

11,139

 

D

827,280

each of them get if they share

2. [(48,376 – 16,758) × 2] ÷ 4 =

their sweets equally among themselves?

A

15,809

 

C

6,660

 

A

59

C

73

B

13,809

D

3,606

B

68

D

76

3. (3,954 × 60) + (83,400 ÷ 100) =

10. school received 25 boxes of

A

A 237,240

 

C

238,074

 

pens to be distributed equally among 15 classes. If each box

B 237,420

D

243,074

has 48 pens, how many pens

4. (4,625 ÷ 25) + (1,111 × 101) =

A

112,396

C

367,259

B

112,369

D

376,259

5. Find the value of 3,850,000 ÷ 50 – 5.

A

77,000

C

65,555

B

76,995

D

55,556

6. The value of 12,006 + 2 × (1,302

÷ 14) – 8,605 is

A 3,394

C

3,587

B 3,494

D

3,600

7. Calculate the value of (228 × 3 – 241) × 12.

A

5,216

C

5,416

B

5,316

D

5,516

8. Calculate (237,509 + 406,841)

÷

70.

A

9,205

C

9,405

B

9,305

D

9,505

does each class get?

A

70

C

90

B

80

D

100

11. David spent 1,200 Baht at a supermarket. He bought a

box of juice for 70 Baht and

a few tins of milk powder for

300 Baht each. He also bought

2 packs of chocolates for

115 Baht each. How many tins

of milk powder did he buy?

A 1

C 3

B 2

D 4

12. The entrance fee to a bird

park is 200 Baht for an adult and 170 Baht for a student. Teacher Jenny brought 32 students and four other teachers to this bird park. How much was the entrance fee?

A

6,240

C

6,440

B

6,340

D

6,540

14
14
entrance fee? A 6,240 C 6,440 B 6,340 D 6,540 14 02 Pri Edu WB Math
entrance fee? A 6,240 C 6,440 B 6,340 D 6,540 14 02 Pri Edu WB Math

02 Pri Edu WB Math P5.indd

14

entrance fee? A 6,240 C 6,440 B 6,340 D 6,540 14 02 Pri Edu WB Math
entrance fee? A 6,240 C 6,440 B 6,340 D 6,540 14 02 Pri Edu WB Math

2/17/11

entrance fee? A 6,240 C 6,440 B 6,340 D 6,540 14 02 Pri Edu WB Math

9:29:44 AM

13. In a mathematics quiz, Suree got 54 points, Som got 9 points less than Suree but 6 points more than Jimmy. Calculate the total point obtained by them.

A 69

C

138

B 123

D

158

14. Kung started rearing 37,562 fish in a pond. After three months, the number of fish multiplied by three times. He then divided the fish into 6 ponds equally. How many fish were there in each pond?

A

18,781

C

25,041

B

19,781

D

26,041

15. A factory operates 6 days a week. It can produce

3,429 staplers a day. In one particular week, 348 spoilt staplers were found. How many staplers produced that week were not spoilt?

A

20,262

C

4,081

B

20,226

D

3,081

16. Joshua divides 1,764 beads equally among his six brothers and a sister. If his sister already has 3 boxes of beads with 24 beads in each box, calculate the number of beads his sister has altogether.

A 276

C

324

B 318

D

366

Mathematics Pratomsuksa 5

Chapter 2

Mastery Practice

17. Apsara is 16 years old. Her sister is 6 years older than her. Her mother is twice as old as her sister. How old will her mother be in 8 year’s time?

 

A

52

C

62

B

60

D

70

18.

 

Fruit

 

Price

 

Papaya

150 Baht for 6

 

Mango

30 Baht each

The above table shows the prices of fruits sold at a stall. Chanhira bought 18 papayas and 4 mangoes. Jum bought 12 papayas and 6 mangoes. What is the difference between the amount of money paid by Chanhira and Jum?

A 70

C

90

B 80

D

100

19.

Factory X operated for 5 days. It produced 12,000 erasers each day. All the erasers produced on those 5 days were packed into 25 boxes. How many erasers were there in each box?

Which

number

sentence

is

written for

the

above

problem?

 

A

(5 × 12,000) + 25

 

B

(12,000 ÷ 25) ÷ 5

C

5 × 12,000 × 25

D

(5 × 12,000) ÷ 25

 
15
15
C 5 × 12,000 × 25 D (5 × 12,000) ÷ 25   15 02 Pri
C 5 × 12,000 × 25 D (5 × 12,000) ÷ 25   15 02 Pri

02 Pri Edu WB Math P5.indd

15

C 5 × 12,000 × 25 D (5 × 12,000) ÷ 25   15 02 Pri
C 5 × 12,000 × 25 D (5 × 12,000) ÷ 25   15 02 Pri

2/17/11

C 5 × 12,000 × 25 D (5 × 12,000) ÷ 25   15 02 Pri

9:29:44 AM