You are on page 1of 0

1 | Online International Journal of Vedic Mathematics (OIJVM)

TWO STEP METHOD


Novel Method for Squaring and Cubing of Any Number
Vitthal B. Jadhav
Pune, Maharashtra, India.
Email : jadhavvitthal1989@gmail.com
Abstract : This article presents recursion based novel method for squaring and
cubing of any number.

































.
1 2
1 2 1
1 2 3
1 2
1 2 1
Let N be k + 1 digit decimal number and x =10 , Then
N
( .... )
* * * ....... *
* * * .......

(
k
k k k
k n n n n k n k
k k k
n n n
n
n n n k n k
a a a a a
a x a x a x a x a
a x a x a x

+


+
=
= + + + + +
+ + + + =
1
* )
n k n k
a x a
+
+
1
0 1
1 1 2 1 0

N N
N N N
(1)
Also
( )

= ( ) , = ( ) , ..., ( .... )
k k n
n
n n n n n n
x a
a a a a a a a a


= +
=

1
2
1 1
2
1 1 0 0
2 2
2 2 2
2 2 2

N N
N N N
N N N
(By substituting k = n in equation (2) )
Expan
( ) ( )
( ) ( ) * 2 *( * ) ( ) (2)
( ) ( ) * 2 *( * ) ( )

k k n k
k k k n k n k
n n n
x a
x x a a
x x a a


= +
= + +
= + +
1
2
2
2
1 0 0
2 2
2 1 1 1 0 0
4
2
2
2
2 2

2 2

N
N
N
ding above equation recursively using relation (2) , we get
N N
N N
)
)
)
( ) ( * 2 *( * )
( * + 2 *( * ) * 2 *( * )
= ( *
( )
n
n
n
n n
n n
x x a a
x x a a x x a a
x


= + +
= + + +
3
2 2
2 1 1 0 1 0
6 4 2
3 2 2 1 1 0
4 2
2 1 0
2
2 2
2 2 2
N
N N
N N N )
+ 2 * * * * *
( * + 2 * * * * * *
* *
( ) ( )
= ( )
( )
.

n
n n
n n n
x a x a a x a
x x a x a x a
a x a x a



+ + +
+ +
+ + +
0
2 2 2 2
0 1 2 1 1 0
2 2 4 2
1 2 1 0
2 2
0 1
2
2 2 2 2
N N N N
N
) ( * + 2 * * * +..... * * *
* .... * *
2 * * * +.....
.
= ( )
( )
= (
n n
n n n
n
n
n
n
x x a x a x a
a x a x a x a
x a x

+ +
+ + + + +
2
2 1 1 0
2 2 2 4 2
1 2 1 0
0
2 2 2 2

N N
N
* * *
* * .... * *
)
( )
( )
n n
n n
n n
n
a x a
a x a x a x a x a
a

+ +
+ + + + + +
=

Formulation
2 | Online International Journal of Vedic Mathematics (OIJVM)

TWO STEP METHOD

















Examples
1) (1234)
2
= ?
Step 1) (1*2) (12*3) (123*4)

= (02) (0 36 ) (4 92)
0 Carry = 4
= 2 40 92 (Ripple carry addition by taking two digit as sum)

First number = 24092 * 20 = 481840




Step 2) Second number = 01 04 09 16


1
2
2
2
3
2
4
2

(1234)
2
= (First number ) + (Second number )
= 481840 + 01040916 = 01522756

1 2 1 2 2 2 1 3 1
2 1 2 2 2 3 2 2 1 2 0
1 2 1 0
*
2

2 2 2 2 2 2

20
+
( .... ) ( * ) ( * ) ..... ... *
( ) ( ) ( ) ( ) ..... ( ) ( )
( ) ( )
( )
n n n n
n n n n n n
n
n n n
n
n n
a a a a a a a r a a a r r a a a a a
a r a r a r a r r a r a



=


1
3
1 1 1
3 3
3 2
Similarly,
N N
N N N
( ) ( *
( ) * 3*( * )*( ( * ) ( )
)
)*
k k n k
k k n k k n k n k
x a
x x a x a a


= +
+ + + =


3
1 1
3 3 3
0 1 1 2 1 1 1 0
3 3 3 6 3
1 2 1 0
3 3 3
3
3 3 3 3 3
N N N N
N N N N N N N
( ) ( ) * 3*x* * * ( )
( ) 3 * * * * +..... * * * * *
* * .... * *
( )
( )
( )
k k k k n k n k
n
n n n n n n
n n
n n
x a a
x a x a x a
a x a x a x a x a

+ +
= + +
+ + + + + +
=

3 | Online International Journal of Vedic Mathematics (OIJVM)

TWO STEP METHOD
2) (20341)
2
= ?
Step 1) (2*0) (20*3) (203*4) (2034*1)

= (00) (0 60 ) (8 12) (20 34)
0 8 Carry = 20
= 0 68 32 34

First number = 683234 * 20 = 13664680




Step 2) Second number = 04 00 09 16 01


2
2
0
2
3
2
4
2
1
2

(20341)
2
= (First number ) + (Second number )
= 13664680 + 0400091601 = 0413756281
3) (1204)
3
= ?
Step 1) (12) (120) (1204)
Step 2) Multiply each number in parenthesis by its tens and unit place.
i.e. (12 * 1 * 2) (120 * 12*0) (1204 * 120 * 4)

= (024) (0 000 ) (577 920)
0 Carry = 577
= 024 577 920 (Ripple carry addition by taking three digit as sum)

First number = 24577920 * 30 = 737337600



Step 3) Second number = 001 008 000 064

1
3
2
3
0
3
4
3
4 | Online International Journal of Vedic Mathematics (OIJVM)

TWO STEP METHOD

(1204)
3
= (First number ) + (Second number )
= 737337600
+1008000064
(1204)
3
= 1745337664
4) (501)
3
= ?
Step 1) (50 * 5 *0) (501 * 50 * 1)

= (0 000 ) (25 050 )
Carry = 25
= 025 050

First number = 25050 * 30 = 751500



Step 2) Second number = 125 000 001


5
3
0
3
1
3



(501)
3
= (First number ) + (Second number )
= 751500
+125000001
(501)
3
= 125751501
Reference
1) Modern Approach to Speed Math Secret , First edition, 2013.




Exercise
1) Compute square of following numbers

i) 25 ii) 699 iii) 324 iv) 194 v) 118 vi)123456
vii) 831 viii) 891 ix) 65412 x) 32147

2) Compute cube of following numbers

i) 112 ii) 1003 iii) 321 iv) 52 v) 58 vi) 1031
vii)1111 viii) 785 ix) 998 (Hint-998=1002) x) 123