Sie sind auf Seite 1von 17

Mind Power Development Systems

MULTIPLICATION Multiplication with a series of 1.


How to multiply some number (i.e. 23, 46) with 1, 11, 111 in one line? Example:

a) Multiply 23 by 11
23 X 11 253

Explanation:
Step 1: From above 23, write 3 as it is in answer. i.e. Ans. = __3 Step 2: Then add 2 and 3, and write it before 3. i.e. (2+3) Ans. = _53 Step 3: Lastly write 2 as it is. i.e. Ans. = 253 Thus, multiplying (23X11), the answer is 253. Note: In above method, use only 23, dont do anything with 11. Next Example:

b) Multiply 47 by 11.
47 X 11 517

Explanation:
Step 1: From above 47, write 7 as it is in answer. i.e. Ans. = __7 Step 2: Then add 4 and 7, and write it before 7. i.e. (4+7=11) Ans. = _17 Step 3: The rule is to write 4 as it is but if there is any carry then add that carry to the last digit i.e. 4 +1 and write 5 in the starting to get the answer. i.e. Ans. = 517 Thus, multiplying (47X11), the answer is 517.

www.mpdsglobal.com

Mind Power Development Systems

c) Multiply 5102 by 11.


5102 X11 56122

Step 1: From left side write 2 as it is in answer. i.e. Ans. = ____2 Step 2: Then add 0 and 2, and write it before 2. i.e. (0+2) Ans. = ___22 Step 3: Leave 2 and add 0 and 1. i.e. Ans. = __122 Step 4: Now leave 0 and add 5 and 1. i.e. (5+1) Ans. = _6122 Step 5: Lastly write 5 as it is. i.e. Ans. = 56122 Thus, multiplying (5102 X 11), the answer is 56122.

d) Multiply 902 by 111.


902 X111 100122 Step 1: From left side of 902 write 2 as it is in answer. i.e. Ans. = _____2 Step 2: Then add 0 and 2, and write it before 2. i.e. (0+2) Ans. = ____22 Step 3: Add 9, 0 and 2 (sum = 11) and write 1 before above answer. i.e. (9+0+2 = 11) Ans. = ___122 Step 4: Now add 9 and 0. Also add the carry 1 and write it before above answer. i.e. (9+0+1 = 10) Ans. = __0122 Step 5: Lastly add 9 and the above carry and write it before above answer. i.e. (9+1 = 10) Ans. = 100122 Thus, multiplying (902 X 111), the answer is 100122.

e) Multiply 3042 by 111.


3042 X111 337662

Step 1: From left side of 3042 write 2 as it is in answer. i.e. Ans. = _____2
www.mpdsglobal.com

Mind Power Development Systems

Step 2: Then add 4 and 2, and write it before 2. i.e. Ans. = ____62 Step 3: Add 0, 4 and 2. i.e. Ans. = ___662 Step 4: Now leave 2, the last digit and then add 3, 0 and 4. i.e. (5+1) Ans. = __7662 Step 5: Leave 4 and add 3 and 0. i.e. Ans. = _37662 Step 6: Lastly write 3 as it is. i.e. Ans. = 337662 Thus, multiplying (3042 X 111), the answer is 337662.

Next Method:
00304200 X111 337662 Step 1: In this method, if we have to multiply any digit with 111 then place 00 in left and right side of the number. Step 2: Then add 0, 0 and 2. i.e. Ans. = _____2 Step 3: Leave first 0 and add 4, 2 and 0. i.e. Ans. = ____62 Step 4: Now leave second 0, and then add 0, 4 and 2. i.e. (5+1) Ans. = ___662 Step 5: Then leave 2 and add 3, 0 and 4 . i.e. Ans. = __7662 Step 6: Leave 4 and add 0, 3 and 0. i.e. Ans. = _37662 Step 7: Again leave 0 and add 0, 0 and 3. i.e. Ans. = 337662 Thus, multiplying (3042 X 111), the answer is 337662. Note: In this method, even the number of 1s is large just reduce one step and replace 0 on both left and right side of the number to be multiplied. (i.e. replace 000 if there is 4 digit number to be multiplied. Similarly in 2 digit 1, replace only 0 and add 2-2 digits to get the answer.) 47 X 11 517 5102 X 11 56122 902 X 11 9922 902 X 111 100122 3042 X 111 337662
www.mpdsglobal.com

Mind Power Development Systems

Explanation: when we multiply same digit with same 11 then we have to keep last digit same and then have to add two digit and at last keep the last digit as it is. When we multiply with the upper digit which is less than lower digit then we keep 1st digit same and then we add two digit and when there is two digit then we add with two equal digit and again we add two digit. Again if there is 3 s 1 digit then do as above but only add 3-3 digit with last digit at added two digit and at last keep it as it is. Next example: Multiply 402356 by 1111 402356 X 1111 STEPS Keep last digit as same. Add (6 +5 =11) Add (6+5+3=14) Add (2+3+5+6=16) Add (5+3+2+0=10) Add (3+2+0+4=9) Add (2+0+4=6) Add(0+4=4) Add (=4)

6 16 516 7516 17516 017516 7017516 47017516 447017516

402356 X 1111 = 447017516 f): Multiplication of any number with a series of similar digits in multiplier multiply 204 X 22 Explanation: multiply 204 with 2 (i.e 204 X 2 )= 408 change 22 with 11. At last , multiply 204 X 2 =408 rather than multiplying 204 with 22 and change 22 with 11.(i.e 408 11) and multiply with the above method. 408 X 11 4488 Multiplying 204 X 22 is equal to 4488. Another example Multiply 444 by 333
www.mpdsglobal.com

Mind Power Development Systems

STEPS: Step 1 : 444 X 3 = 1332. Step 2: change 333 by 111. Steps 3:Do same as above method. Step 4: 1332 X 1111 147852 The final answer is 444 X 333 = 147852 Note: This method is applicable only for the digit multiple up to 8 .

G): Multiplying only 11 with 11 Multiply 11 by 11 11 X 11 121 Explanation: Step 1: First of all,we have to put 1,2 at answer at down for multiplying 2 digit. Step 2: Then write 2 after 1. Multiplying 11 X 11 is equal to 121.

Multiply 11111 by 11111 Step 1: First of all ,write 5 digit for 5 digit multiplication(i.e 1 2 3 4 5 ). Step 2: Then,writing up to 5 digit ,we have to write again 4 to 1(i.e 1 2 3 4 5 4 3 2 1).

The final answer is 11111 X 1111 = 123454321. (2). Multiplication of number with a series of 9. If upper and lower digit is equal. a) Multiply 99 by 99. 99 X99 st 1 part<-- 98/01 --> 2nd part

www.mpdsglobal.com

Mind Power Development Systems

Explanation Step 1: At first we have less 1 from 99 for the answer at 1st part(i.e 99-1=98). Step 2: Then after ,for 98,we have to less as 9-9=0 and 9-8=1 for 2nd part answer ,write 01. The final answer for 99 X 99 is equal to 9801. (b) Multiply 24608 by 99999 24608 X 99999 24607\75392 (24608-1)

1st part 2nd part Explanation: Step 1: First write 24608-1=24607 in first part. Step 2: In second part subtract each digit in first part by 9 i.e. 9-2=7, 9-4=5, 9-6=3, 9-0=9, and 9- 7=2, i.e. 75932. Thus, the final answer is (24608 X 99999) = 2460775392. (c) Multiply 9820 by 9999. 9820 X 9999 9819/0180 1st part 2nd part Step 1: 9820-1=9819 (1st part) Step 2: 9999-9819 = 0180 (2nd part). Thus, the final answer is 98209999 = 98190180. *If upper digits are less than the lower digits. (d) Multiply 923 by 9999. 0923 9999 0922/9077 1st part 2nd part

www.mpdsglobal.com

Mind Power Development Systems

Explanation: Step 1: Add a 0 in front of the upper digit to make equal number of digits to that in lower. Step 2: Subtract 1 from 0923 (0923-1=0922). Step 3: 9999-0922 = 9077 in 2nd part. Thus, the final answer is 9239999 = 9229077. (e) Multiply 243 by 99999. 243 99999 change 00243 99999 00242/99757 1st part 2nd part

Explanation: Step 1: Add 0s to make upper digits equal in number to that in lower. Step 2: Subtract 1 from 00243 (00243-1=00242). Step 3: 99999-00242 = 99757. Thus, the final answer is 24399999 = 24299757. F) If upper digits are more than lower digits. (a) Multiply 732 by 99. 732 X 99 (100-1) 73200 - 732 72468 Explanation: Step 1: In this method, multiply 732 with 100(732 X 100= 73200) and wrote at down. Step 2: Then after put at digit and multiply 732 with 1(732 X 1=732) . Step 3: At last, subtract both and make the final answer. 732 X 100 = 73200 732 X (-1) = -732 72468 The final answer is 732 X 99 =72468
www.mpdsglobal.com

Mind Power Development Systems

(b) Multiply 9234 by 999 9234 X 999 (1000-1) 9234000 - 9234 9224766 Explanation: Step 1: 9234 X 1000 = 923400 Step 2: 9234 X -1 = -9234 9224766 The final answer is 9234 X 999 = 9224766. G) Base Method of Multiplication Multiplying with closer to power of digit of 10
I. Multiply 12 by 14 (closer to 10) 12 + 2 X 14 + 4 16 8

L.H.S

R.H.S

(Note: There is one 0s at the power 10 , which is multiplied and wrote at one digit ). Explanation: Step 1: First of all ,we have find the closer base and differences of 12 and 14, (i.e 12 and 14 is closer to 10,base is 0 and difference is 2 and 4). Step 2: write same digit as much 0 at R.H.S. Step 3: Multiply the difference digit. Step 4: Find the cross answer and write at L.H.S(i.e 12+ 4 = 16 or 14 +2 = 16). Multiplying 12 X 14 is equal to 168.

www.mpdsglobal.com

Mind Power Development Systems II. Multiply 997 by 995. difference Closer to 1000) 997 - 3 X 995 - 5 992 / 015 (write 3 digit due to 3 base numeric) Explanation: Step 1: Closer to 1000-997 = 3 Closer to 1000-995 = 5 Step 2: write 5 X 3 = 15 at L.H.S but there is three 0 at base so write 3 digit. i. e 015. Step 3: Put 997-5 = 992 or 995-3=992 at R.H.S. The final answer is 997 X 995 = 992015. III. Multiply 10012 by 9992 10012 + 12 X 9992 8 10004/0 0(-9 6) Or, 10004 X 10000- 16 Or,100040000-96=100039904 Explanation: Step 1:Write the 10000 which is closer to 10012 & 9992. Step 2 :Find the difference. Step 3: Multiply 12 & 8 at R.H.S.(answer is +12 X (-8)= - 96). Step 4: Subtract or add from the cross given(answer is 10012-8 =10004). Step 5: As there is negative answer at L.H.S,so multiply 10004 by 10000 at R.H.S and subtract with 96.(answer is 10004 X 10000-96 = 100039904). The final answer is 10012 x 9992 = 100039904. IV. Multiply 960 by 960 differences Closer to 1000) 960 40 X 960 40 920/600 Multiply Base +1 left 921600 (Final Answer) www.mpdsglobal.com

Mind Power Development Systems

V. Base method of Squaring Method a).Multiply 98 by 98 (98)^2 Difference 98 (2) 96/04 L.H.S R.H.S

Base

(100

Explanation: Step 1: Find the base and difference for 98.so,base will be 100 and difference will be 2. Step 2: Subtract from 98-2 = 96. We write in the L.H.S.(answer is 98-2 = 96) Step 3: Square of 2 i.e 2 X2 = 4 but base will be 2 zero.so, we write 04 in the R.H.S.(Answer is 2 X2 =04,9604) The final answer is 98 X 98 = 9804. VI. Square of 109 100) 109 + 9 118/81 Explanation: Step 1: Find the base of 109,which is 100. Step 2: Add 109 & 9 and write at L.H.S. i.e 109 + 9= 118. Step 3: There is two base so put 2 digit number and multiply 9 X 9 and write.i.e 9 X 9 = 81. The square of 109 is 11881. VII. Square of 997 difference Base 1000) 997 3 994/009 Explanation: Step 1:Find the base of 997 ,which is 1000. Step 2: 1000-997 = 3(difference). Step 3: 997 -3 = 994. Step 4: Square of 3 is 9 but there is 3 zero at base so put 3 digit number. i.e 3 ^=009. The final answer of squaring 997 is 994009. www.mpdsglobal.com

Mind Power Development Systems

3. Multiplication of any no, with a series of 12. a. Multiply 256 by 12 0256 X 12 3072 Explanation: Step 1: Multiply 6 X 2 ,write only 2 and carry the left 1.(Answer: 2) . Step 2: Double the upper 5 as like 5+5=10 and add the upper 6 with carry 1(answer is 5+5+6+1=72). Step 3: Double the 2 and add 5 with the carry 1(Answer is 2+2+5+1 = 072). Step 4: Double the 0 and add 0+2= 2and then add carry 1(Answer is 0 +2+1= 3). The final answer is 256 X 12 =3072. b. Multiply 623 by 12 0623 X 12 7476 Explanation: Step 1: 3 X2 =6. Step 2: 2+2+3=7. Step 3: 6+6+2=4. Step 4: 0+0+6+(carry)1=7. The final answer is 7476. Note: put the 0 before the any digit. 5. Squaring of any number ending with 5. a. (65)^2=? 65 X65 42/25 (5X5)

4225 Explanation: Step 1: 5 X5 = 25(answer = 25). Step 2: 6 comes after 7 so multiply 6 X 7(answer is 6 x 7 =4225). The final answer is (6 5)^2=4225. www.mpdsglobal.com

Mind Power Development Systems

b.

(85)^2 = 7225

Explanation: Step 1: 5 X 5=25 and 8 comes after 9.so,8 X 9= 72.i.e final answer is 85 X 85=7225. i. ii. iii. iv. (95)^2 = 9025 (75)^2= 5625 (105)^2= 11025 (125)^2=15625

(6). Differnet different digit but adding last digit which comes with 10 and multiplying. 73 X 79 5627 93 X 97 9021

Condition: here it comes 10 by adding the upper and lower of the last and then it is equal at the backside by upper and lower digits. Then only its valid. Step 1: write 3 X 9= 27. Step 2: 7 comes after 8 so, 7 x 8 = 56 i.e final answer is 5627. More Examples 21 X 29 = 609 53 X 57 = 3021 81 X 89 = 7209 7). Squaring of any number between 50 - 60 . i. 53 X53 28/09

Explanation: First of all, add 25 and then add the last digit 3(25+3)=28 at L.H.S. multiply 3X3=9 but write two digits instead of single digit i.e 09 t R.H.S.

ii.

57 X57 3249 www.mpdsglobal.com

Mind Power Development Systems

Step 1: 25 +7 =32 at L.H.S. Step 2:7 X 7 = 49 at R.H.S. The final answer is 3249.

More Examples 54 X 54= 2916 (25 + 4 = 29 and 4 X4 =16 ,i.e 2916) 55 X 55 = 3025 (25 + 5= 30 and 5X5=25,i. e 3025)e.t.c.

CRISS-CROSS METHOD
In this method, we can multiply any number with any number. It can be applicable with similar as well as unsimilar digit. This method is also used for the above multiplication technique to multiply with the same technique. Lets see few Example: a) Multiply 23 by 53 STEP 1: 2 3 5 3 9 STEP 2: 2 5 1 3 3 9 (6+15=21) (3 x3)

www.mpdsglobal.com

Mind Power Development Systems STEP 3: 2 3

5 3(2 X 5=10+2 carry=12) 1219

b) Multiply 4 by 26 04 X26 104

Direction: -> If there is less digit at down side or the vice versa then put 0 at there is less to make it equal and then solve it.

Notification: Step 1: 0 2 4 6 (4 X 6= 24) 4

Step 2: 0 2 0 Step 3: 4 6 (0 X 6=0+4 X2=8, i.e 0 X 8+2 carry=10) 4

2 6 (0 X 2=0+1 carry=1) 104

www.mpdsglobal.com

Mind Power Development Systems

Explanation: Step 1: Multiplying 4 &6 gives 24 answer but write 4 instead of 24 and put carry over 2. (Answer is 4) Step 2: Multiplying 0 & 6,4 &2 gives 0 & 8 which is added and then left carry over 2 is also added.(again if carry over comes then it is added or if not then no adding). (Answer is 0 + 8 +2 = 10,04) Step 3: At last multiplying 0 &2 with adding carry over(0 X 2 + carry 1 =1). (Answer is 104) The final answer is 4 X 26=104. c). Multiplying 248 by 235. 248 2 35 58280 Notification: Step 1: 2 4 8 X 2 3 5 (8 X 5 = 40 ,carry over 4) 0 Step 2: 2 4 8

X 2 3 5 (5 X 4 +8 X 3=44 ,carry over 4) 8 0 Step 3: 2 4 8

X 2 3 5 (5 X 2 +4 X 3+2 X 8= 38,carry over 4) 2 4 0

www.mpdsglobal.com

Mind Power Development Systems Step 4: 2 4 8

X 2 3 5 (3 X 2 +4 X 2+carry 4=18,carry over 1) 8240 Step 5: 2 4 8

2 3 5 (2 X 2 +carry 1=5) 58240

The final answer is 58240.

d) Notification Step 1:

Four Digit Multiply Step 2:

Step 3:

Step 4:

Step 5:

Step 6:

www.mpdsglobal.com

Mind Power Development Systems Step 7:

Multiply 3012 by 4012 3 0 1 2 X4 0 1 2 12084148 Step1: (2 x 2)= 8 Step 2: (2 X1)+(1 X 2)=4 Step 3: (0 X 2)+(0 X2)+(1 X 1)=1 Step 4: (3 X 2)+(4 X 2)+(0 X 1)+(0X1)= 14(carry over 1) Step 5: (4 X 1)+(3 X 1)+(0 X 0)+(1 carry)=8 Step 6: (4 X 0)+(0 X 3)= 0 Step 7: (3 X 4)= 12 Note: we have seen multiplication of 2 digit,3 digit,4 digit but if we have do multiplication of 5 digit,6 digit etc. or unequal digit then do it as shown below: If there is unequal digit then first change it into equal digit to solve the problem as: 2 4 9 X3902 0 2 4 9 X 39 0 2

4 5 9 X 34

4 5 2 X0 3 4

Where there is unequal digit then keep 0 for making equal.

PRACTICE IS THE PRICE THAT YOU PAY FOR PERFECTION.

www.mpdsglobal.com